Vedic Mathematics Trick for Multiply by 11

Hi friends, in this Vedic Mathematics tutorial I am going to share How to multiply any number by 11 quickly. Just follow some simple steps and you will get your answer in couple of seconds.

1) Multiply 2 digit number by 11

Let us multiply 72 by 11 using Vedic Mathematics trick.

Step 1: Split 72 as follows:

7_2

Step 2: Add 7 and 2, and write addition in between 7 and 2. So will get our answer as

792

Thus 72*11=792

Now what if addition becomes two digit number. In such case we just need to add 1 in adjacent left digit. Let us take another example for this condition.

Multiply 85 by 11.

Step 1: Split 85 as follows:

8_5

Step 2: Add 8 and 5 and write addition in between them. But here addition becomes 13 and if we write 13 in between 8 and 5 answer becomes 8135 which is wrong. So in such situations we need to write only 3 (from 13) and add 1 in 8. See below example.

 

Multiply-by-11-for-two-digit-vedic-mathematics

2) Multiply 3 digit number by 11

Let us multiply 345 by 11

Step 1: Split 345 as follows

3 _ _ 5

Step 2: Add  (3+4) and (4+5) and write in between 3 and 5. So we will get our answer as

3795

Thus 345*11=3795

Now what if addition becomes two digit number. In such case we just need to add 1 in adjacent left digit. Let us take another example for this condition.

Multiply 849 by 11

Step 1: Split 849 as follows

8_ _9

Step 2: Add (8+4=12) and (4+9=13) and write in between 8 and 9. But here addition is two digit numbers (12 and 13) so we need to add 1 in adjacent left digits as follows.

Multiply by 11 for three digit vedic mathematics

Have you enjoyed this article? Please provide your feedback in comment section below. If you have any doubts feel to ask us! Like our facebook page for future updates.

How to square and multiply numbers quick and easily – Vedic mathematics method

Tutorial 4: How to square and multiply numbers quick and easily – Vedic mathematics method.

Addition, division, subtraction and multiplica...
Addition, division, subtraction and multiplication symbols (Photo credit: Wikipedia)

Part 1): A simple and quick method on How to square a number ending with 5.

In this tutorial we are going to learn one simple method of Vedic mathematics to make the square of a number which ends with 5.

Whenever a number ends with 5, definitely the last two digits will be 25. Now the remaining part of the answer can be calculated by multiplying a number with its next. For example if the given number is 35 then first part will be 25 and the remaining part will be 3×4=12. So the answer is 1225.

Example: Find square of 15.

tutorial 4 1

Here the last two digits will be 25 and the first two digits are calculated by 1×2=02. So the answer is 225.

Let us take another example for clear understanding.

Example: Find square of 65.

Solution: first part will be 6×7=42. So the answer is 4225.

tutorial 4 2

Part 2): Multiplication of two numbers having first digit same and last digits add up to 10.

Example: Multiply 46×44.

Solution:

tutorial 4 3 myclassbook.org

  • Bothe numbers having digit 4 same.
  • Last digits that are 6 and 4 add up to 10.
  • So we just multiply 4×5 =20 for getting first part of the answer.
  • Also multiply last digits (6×4=24) for second part of the answer.
  • So the answer is 2024.

Example: Multiply 71×79.

Solution:

tutorial 4 4 myclassbook.org

  • Bothe numbers having digit 7 same.
  • Last digits that are 1 and 9 add up to 10.
  • So we just multiply 7×8=56 for getting first part of the answer.
  • Also multiply last digits (9×1=09) for second part of the answer.
  • So the answer is 5609.

 Related articles

Tags: How to square numbers quickly, fast square root, how to square a number fast, how to square large numbers quickly.

How to add and subtract fractions easily – Vedic mathematics methods

Tutorial 3: Quick and easy method for addition and subtraction of two fractions.

Hi friends, today we are going to learn one more simple and fast vedic mathematics method for addition and subtraction of two fractions.

Addition of two fraction numbers:

In this method we simply multiply crosswise and add them to get numerator of the answer and multiply bottom (denominators) of two fractions to get the bottom of answer (see example).

Example 1: tutorial 3 addition and subtraction of fractions1 Multiply crosswise and add to get the numerator of the answer. Here 5×4=20 and 7×3=21. Then 20+21=41. The bottom of the fraction is just 3×4=12. So the answer is 41/12. Subtraction of two fraction numbers: Subtraction is same as that of addition; only the difference is that we have to subtract cross multiplication. In this method we simply multiply crosswise and subtract them to get numerator of the answer and multiply bottom (denominators) of two fractions to get the bottom of answer (see example). Example 1:  tutorial 3 addition and subtraction of fractions12 Multiply crosswise and subtract to get the numerator of the answer. Here 5×4=20 and 7×3=21. Then 20-21=-1. The bottom of the fraction is just 3×4=12. So the answer is -1/12.  

You may also like:

Tags: how to add and subtract fractions step by step, Vedic mathematics method for addition and subtraction of two fractions, easy and quick method.

Fast Multiplication of Two Numbers – Vedic Mathematics Trick

Hi friends, in this post you will learn about fast method for multiplication of two numbers. This method is known as Vedic Mathematics method for multiplication of two numbers.

Using vertically and crosswise multiplication we can easily find the multiplication of two numbers. Using this method we can multiply two numbers which are near to 10 or 100 within few seconds. For clear understanding we will solve some examples.

Example 1: Multiply 7 × 8.

Solution: Here 7 is 3 below 10 and 8 is 2 below 10.

Therefore we write as follows:

tutorial 2 multiplication of two numbers 1

The answer is 56. Here we get 6 from 3×2 and then 5 from (8-3) or (7-2).

Important note: In case if we get two digit vertical multiplications we have to think of carry (See example).

Example 2: Multiply 7 × 6.

Solution: Here 7 is 3 below 10 and 6 is 4 below 10. So the vertical multiplication will be 12. Here we have to add ‘1’ to the next place of answer (See below).

tutorial 2 multiplication of two numbers 2

Now let us solve one more example of multiplication of numbers which are closer to 100.

Example 3: Multiply 94 × 88.

Solution: Though it looks very difficult to multiply 94 by 88, yet it is very simple because both numbers are close to 100. 94 is 6 below 100 and 88 is 12 below 100.

tutorial 2 multiplication of two numbers 3

Here we get 72 by multiplying 6 with 12 and then 82 from (88-6) or (94-12).

You may also like:

I hope you understood how to make multiplication of two numbers quickly using Vedic Mathematics method. If you liked this article please subscribe our newsletter and like our facebook page.

 

How to do fast subtraction – Vedic mathematics method

Tutorial 1: How to do fast subtraction within seconds.

Vedic mathematics is an ancient method of Indian mathematics which was rediscovered from the Vedas between 1911 and 1918 by Sri Bharati Krishna Tirthaji (1884-1960).

In this section I am going to post vedic mathematics tricks daily, which will help you to make calculations easier and faster than normal methods. So let us start our Vedic maths first tutorial.

In this tutorial we are going to make subtraction of any number from 100, 1000, 1000, 10000 and so on.

Subtract all digits from 9 and last digit from 10 (See example).

Example 1: Subtract 786 from 1000.

vedic maths subtraction tutorial 1

Step: In this example we have subtracted 7 and 8 from 9 and then 6 from 10 resulting 214.

Example 2: Subtract 4687 from 10000

vedic maths subtraction tutorial 1

Step: Here 4, 6 and 8 are subtracted from 9 and then 7 is subtracted from 10.

Important note: When we have more zeros than figures in the number being subtracted then don’t forget to write zeros before the number so as to make same length (See example).

Example 3: Subtract 79 from 10000.

Solution: Here we have 2 digits in 79 and 4 zeros in 10000. Therefore write 0079.vedic maths subtraction tutorial 1

You may also like:

Tags: subtracting two digit numbers, how to subtract 3 digit numbers. fast method for doing subtraction of two numbers. Learn how to do subtraction within seconds.